L.M. v. Uber Technologies, Inc et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04307 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
L. M.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/26 4:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 4:49 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084 Opened in California Northern District as L.M. v. Uber Technologies, Inc et al 3:24-cv-04307-CRB cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 10:43 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/18 7:31 AM
Proposed Summons. (Grubbs, Donald) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 7:27 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19632058.). Filed by L. M..(Grubbs, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |