Doe (BW) v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04308 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Northern District of California, MDL 3084 CRB |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 2:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe (BW)
Nachawati Law Group 5489 Blair Road
DALLAS, TX 75231 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/19 11:02 AM
Proposed Summons. (Schulte, Steve) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/19 10:28 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . 1) Submit one proposed summons listing all defendants. Attach additional pages if needed. 2) Proposed Summons must be docketed as a separte entry. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Jane Doe (BW) (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 10:34 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL No. 3084: Doe (BW) v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04308-CRB p cc: JPMDL (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 10:39 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 7:22 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19632055.). Filed by Jane Doe (BW).(Schulte, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons-Uber, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons-Rasier, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons-Rasier-CA |