PATEL v. JADDOU
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc T Treadwell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00239 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Complaint (IFP)
Mon 08/05 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT (IFP) against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs(CHAUDHARY, BHAVYA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons for Ur Jaddou, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons for MDGA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A- I918 Receipt Dhruv, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B- USCIS Policy Manual, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C- 1765 C14 Receipt Dhruv, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D- Biometrics Appointment Notice Dhruv | ||
4 | 4
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/05 12:32 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:3 Order to Show Cause, by DHRUV VINODKUMAR PATEL (CHAUDHARY, BHAVYA) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 07/29 11:48 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by August 5, 2024, why his claims against Ur M Jaddou should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's prior orders to file his complaint in a text searchable format. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 7/29/2024. (kat) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 07/22 10:00 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Deficiency ; Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. When refiling the complaint select the event "COMPLAINT (IFP)" to avoid paying the filing fee again, See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Participants are expected to make corrections within 2 business days of receiving the Notice of Deficiency. If corrections are not made in a timely manner, the matter will be referred to chambers and may result in an Order to Show Cause. See Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing. (ggs) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 07/18 11:16 AM
Summons Issued as to UR M JADDOU, U.S. Attorney (Civil Process Clerk).(ggs) |
|
Att: 1 Summons U.S. ATTORNEY (Civil Process Clerk) | ||
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Thu 07/18 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4702151, $405 filed by All Defendants(CHAUDHARY, BHAVYA) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons US Attorney, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons Jaddou, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A- I918 Receipt, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B- Policy Guidance, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C- I-765 Receipt, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D- Biometrics Notice | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/18 11:09 AM
US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE no longer assigned to case. (ggs) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 07/18 11:56 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and re-filed. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. When refiling the complaint select the event "COMPLAINT (IFP)" to avoid paying the filing fee again. (ggs) |