Around the Clock Oil, LLC
Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Paul M Black |
Case #: | 7:24-bk-70513 |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Around the Clock Oil, LLC
1818 Centre Ave NW
Roanoke, VA 24017-5534 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
USTrustee
Office of the United States Trustee 210 First Street, Suite 505
Roanoke, VA 24011 |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Mon 08/26 7:20 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC . Hearing scheduled 9/9/2024 at 11:30 AM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. (Cox, H.) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Wed 08/21 6:12 PM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 18, 2024, through July 31, 2024 Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC. (Cox, H.) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Employ
Mon 08/19 11:56 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Cox Law Group, Debtor's Counsel. (White, Kristen) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Held
Wed 08/14 4:29 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held USTrustee . (King, B.) |
|
30 | 30
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Wed 08/14 9:37 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (White, Kristen) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 08/13 6:09 PM
Receipt of Amendment to Creditor Matrix - Fee([LINK 24-70513 ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A10853332. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Amendment to Creditor Matrix - Fee
Tue 08/13 6:05 PM
Amendment to Creditor Matrix. Certification attached. Fee Amount $34 Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC. (Cox, H.) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Certification Regarding Balance of Schedules
Tue 08/13 6:04 PM
Certification Regarding Balance of Schedules Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC . (Cox, H.) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Balance of Schedules
Tue 08/13 5:20 PM
Balance of Schedules filed. Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC. (Cox, H.) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 08/13 8:46 AM
Second Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Around the Clock Oil, LLC (Cox, H.) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Thu 08/08 7:10 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by GR. Receipt Number 70000171. (admin) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Amended Petition Page
Wed 08/07 9:58 AM
Amended Petition Page (to correct NAICS code and to confirm the Debtor is a small business debtor under section 101(51D) Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC. (Cox, H.) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Report
Fri 08/02 8:17 PM
Report of Documents in Compliance with 11 U.S.C. §§ 1187(a), 1116(1)(A), and 1116(1)(B) Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Around the Clock Oil, LLC. (Cox, H.) |
|
21 | 21
court
Entry
Fri 08/02 2:46 PM
Entry - Payment of $1,738.00 case filing fee received on 8/2/2024, to be receipted on court's next cashiering day (8/7/2024) (Nichols, Elizabeth) |
|
20 | 20
order
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Fri 08/02 10:19 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (White, Kristen) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Thu 08/01 8:05 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor Around the Clock Oil, LLC (Cox, H.) |
|
18 | 18
17
pgs
motion
Employ
Thu 08/01 8:04 PM
Application to Employ Cox Law Group, PLLC, as Counsel Filed by Debtor Around the Clock Oil, LLC Hearing scheduled 8/26/2024 at 09:30 AM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. (Cox, H.) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 07/28 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/27/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 07/27 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 07/26 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 07/26 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
Notice of Inquiry
Thu 07/25 9:12 AM
Notice of Inquiry (Adams, Marleca) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
Wed 07/24 2:40 PM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, Deadlines for Election Under 11 USC 1111 b 2, and other deadlines. . Hearing scheduled 9/9/2024 at 11:30 AM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. In the alternative, parties may appear by video by using instructions contained in this order and available on the court website. Proofs of Claims due by 9/26/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/14/2025. Pre-Status Report Due by 8/26/2024. (White, Kristen) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/24 10:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Compton M. Biddle on behalf of GABLE HOLDINGS, LLC. (Biddle, Compton) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
DIP - Debtor in Possession
Tue 07/23 10:44 AM
Order - Debtor in Possession . (White, Kristen) |
|
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 07/23 10:36 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/14/2024 at 01:00 PM via crmtg Ch 11: By telephone. Dial 1-877-451-9313, Passcode 9499523. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/15/2024. (White, Kristen) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
trustee
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Tue 07/23 10:24 AM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Paula S. Beran [Ch.11] added to the case. USTrustee. (Garber, Margaret) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit Verfied Statement | ||
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 07/22 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 07/22 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 07/22 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Deficiency Schedules Due
Fri 07/19 2:11 PM
Order of Deficiency Schedules Due . Schedule A/B due 8/1/2024. Schedule D due 8/1/2024. Schedule E/F due 8/1/2024. Schedule G due 8/1/2024. Schedule H due 8/1/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/1/2024.Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 8/1/2024. Form 106Dec due 8/1/2024. (Adams, Marleca) |
|
3 | 3
order
Deficiency re: Payment of First Installment and/or Case Filing Fee
Fri 07/19 2:09 PM
Order Directing Payment of First Installment and/or Case Filing Fee. Case Filing Fee Due in the Amount of $ 1738.00. Case Filing Fee Due by 8/2/2024. Corporate Attorney Due by 8/2/2024. (Adams, Marleca) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Inquiry
Fri 07/19 2:02 PM
Notice of Inquiry (Adams, Marleca) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Thu 07/18 10:45 AM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Around the Clock Oil, LLC Incomplete Filings Due by 8/1/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/16/2024. (Martin, Julie) |