Halliday v. Target Corporation et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Omar A Williams |
Referred: | Maria E Garcia |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01211 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Target Enterprise, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Target Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet Halliday
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 09/03 5:03 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Janet Halliday.Responses due by 9/24/2024(Federici, Louis) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Redlined Complaint | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/30 3:05 PM
Amended Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1 by Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc.. (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection
Wed 08/21 4:40 PM
OBJECTION to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Janet Halliday. (Federici, Louis) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 08/14 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY CLAIM by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc..(Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 08/01 3:49 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis M. Federici, Jr on behalf of Janet Halliday (Federici, Louis) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Electronic Service Documents
Thu 07/18 4:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of10 Electronic Filing Order,12 Standing Order re: Letters,13 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,8 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation,9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,11 Standing Protective Order,3 Notice of Appearance filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation,7 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation,1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation,5 Disclosure Statement filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation,4 Notice (Other) filed by Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Corporation Signed by Clerk on 07/18/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases | ||
13 | 13
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Thu 07/18 4:24 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Peterson, M) |
|
12 | 12
intord
Standing Order re: Letters
Thu 07/18 4:23 PM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 07/18/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
11 | 11
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Thu 07/18 4:23 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 07/18/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
10 | 10
order
Electronic Filing Order
Thu 07/18 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 07/18/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Thu 07/18 4:22 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2024. Discovery due by 1/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2025. Signed by Clerk on 07/18/2024. (Peterson, M) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 2:55 PM
NOTICE by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc. Certification of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc. of Standing Order in Removed Cases (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 2:26 PM
NOTICE by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc. of Civil Misc Notes and Orders (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 2:23 PM
Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc.. (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/18 2:18 PM
NOTICE by Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc. of No Motions Pending in State Court (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/18 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M. Neborsky on behalf of Target Corporation, Target Enterprise, Inc., Target Stores, Inc. (Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 12:41 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/18/2024.(Maturo, F.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc. from Superior Court at Milford, case number AAN-CV-24-6056863-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7839047, filed by Target Corporation, Target Stores, Inc., Target Enterprise, Inc..(Neborsky, Dawn) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/18 1:14 PM
Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.) |
||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/23 3:57 PM
Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/31/2024. (Velez, F) |