4
|
|
4
misc
Attorney Disciplinary Letter
Tue 08/20 10:31 AM
Letter dated August 13, 2024 from the Louisiana Supreme Court to the United States Supreme Court Re: Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings. Action Taken: Mr. Hjortsberg has satisfied his requirements for reinstatement to the practice of law in Louisiana, effective August 12, 2024. (EDC)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 1:32 PM
ORDER: ROBERT WILLIAM HJORTSBERG, Louisiana Bar no. 31587 is hereby SUSPENDED, effective 07/18/2024, from practice of law before this Court, unless he shows good cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why he should not be SUSPENDED. The SUSPENSION hereby ordered shall continue until further order of this court. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/26/2024. (EDC)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Attorney Disciplinary Letter
Tue 07/23 9:42 AM
Letter dated July 18, 2024 from the Louisiana Supreme Court to the United States Supreme Court Re: Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings. Action Taken: Suspension for six months with all but thirty days deferred. (EDC)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Attorney Disciplinary Letter
Thu 07/18 10:08 AM
Letter dated July 10, 2024 from the Louisiana Supreme Court to the United States Supreme Court Re: Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings. Action Taken: Suspended for six months with all but thirty days deferred. (EDC)
Related: [-]
|