Brown v Target Corporation
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jonathan JC Grey |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11857 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Wayne County Circuit Court, 24-008181-NO |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertha Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/14 9:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/21/2025; Discovery due by 2/28/2025; Jury Trial set for 7/8/2025 08:30 AM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/30 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey: Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2024. Scheduling order to follow. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SOso) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Tue 07/23 11:41 AM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Marzano, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appear*
Fri 07/19 10:38 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2024 02:00 PM before District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ***Parties are to file a FRCP 26(f) one week prior to conference*** (SOso) |
|
Att: 1 Document Continuation | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 07/18 3:52 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Target Corporation (Marzano, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/18 3:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Target Corporation. (Marzano, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 24-008181-NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9867482 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Marzano, Robert) |
|
misc
Addition of Parties
Thu 07/18 11:33 AM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF:. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing1 Notice of Removal, (Marzano, Robert) |
||
misc
Addition of Parties
Thu 07/18 3:42 PM
Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Target Corporation. (Marzano, Robert) |
||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Thu 07/18 4:17 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl) |