Tsang v. United States of America
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Donna M Ryu |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04314 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alameda County Superior Court/Unlimited Civil, 23CV046064 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheuk Yu Tsang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 09/03 8:19 AM
STIPULATION STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by United States of America. (Johns, Douglas) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/30 7:38 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cheuk Yu Tsang.. (Lee, May) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 08/20 5:05 PM
THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Plaintiff's Counsel were also notified via email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/14 9:20 AM
NOTICE by United States of America NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Johns, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/07 7:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Johns, Douglas) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/05 2:11 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Tsang shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 07/26 6:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/26 1:18 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO ATTORNEY MAY LEE DEMARTY: The contact information appearing on document #7 is different from your personal profile information in ECF. Please update your personal profile information for current contact information to be in effect. Re:7 Notice of Appearance filed by Cheuk Yu Tsang (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 07/25 2:14 PM
STIPULATION STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Johns, Douglas) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by May Lee (Lee, May) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 07/19 11:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 07/19 10:04 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only via Zoom. (sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 8:43 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Johns, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 07/18 8:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,1 Notice of Removal, PROOF OF SERVICE RE: ECFs 1-3, MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYUS STANDING ORDERS & OTHER COURT DOCUMENTS (Johns, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 10:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court, Unlimited Civil. Their case number is 23CV046064. (). Filed by United States of America.(Johns, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-28 U.S.C. 2679d Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |