State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Garcia-Rodriguez et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Goldsmith |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11860 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Juan Humberto Garcia
|
|
Defendant
Juan Garcia-Rodriguez
|
|
Defendant
Alexis Valle Martinez
|
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Juan Humberto Garcia served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (Berlin, Cary) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/12 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Juan Garcia-Rodriguez served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (Berlin, Cary) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/29 12:29 PM
ORDER Regarding Protocols on Filings and Communication with the Court. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (MNee) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
Mon 07/22 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Berlin, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 07/22 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Alexis Valle Martinez* (MSyl) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 07/22 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Juan Garcia-Rodriguez* (MSyl) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 07/22 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Juan Humberto Garcia* (MSyl) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Correction
Mon 07/22 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Correction re3 Summons Issued. (MSyl) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued*
Fri 07/19 10:58 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (MSyl) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 07/19 10:59 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 07/18 12:33 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Berlin, Cary) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Thu 07/18 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9867637 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 23-009487-NO, Judge Charles Hegarty ] (Berlin, Cary) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D |