Carole Prevost v. Central Ohio Transit Authority
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03720 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1391 Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Defendant
Central Ohio Transit Authority
|
|
Plaintiff
Carole Florance Prevost
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/07 2:49 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Carole Florance Prevost. (mve) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/24 11:49 AM
ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, having performed an initial screen, it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED . Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/24/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT against Central Ohio Transit Authority filed by Carole Florance Prevost (kk2) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 11:52 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/24/2024. (This entry is for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF No. 4 for document). (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 3:23 PM
ORDER reassigning this matter to a United States Magistrate Judge in the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 7/22/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/22 3:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. Motions referred to Kimberly A. Jolson. (er) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 2:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carole Florance Prevost. (jlk) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form and USM forms |