Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:24-bk-10264

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mitchell L Herren
Case #: 6:24-ap-05011
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MonetaFi
20200 W Dixie Hwy
Aventura, FL 33180
Represented By
MonetaFi
contact info
Plaintiff
Wilson Building Maintenance Inc
624 E 1st St
Wichita, KS 67202
Represented By
Justin T Balbierz
Mark J Lazzo PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 court Alias Summons Issued Thu 04/24 2:29 PM
Alias Summons Issued on MonetaFi Date Issued 4/24/2025, Answer Due 5/27/2025 . (wdd)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Withdraw Document Thu 04/24 9:38 AM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Wilson Building Maintenance Inc Related [+]. (Lazzo, Mark)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on MonetaFi
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 cmp Summons Request Wed 04/23 8:55 AM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Mark J Lazzo on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on MonetaFi (Lazzo, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Alias Summons Issued Wed 04/23 8:13 AM
Alias Summons Issued on MonetaFi Date Issued 4/23/2025, Answer Due 5/23/2025 . (wdd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
8 8 cmp Summons Request Tue 04/22 4:36 PM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on MonetaFi (Balbierz, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 court Alias Summons Issued Wed 10/09 8:58 AM
Alias Summons Issued on FUNDERS APP LLC Date Issued 10/9/2024, Answer Due 11/8/2024 . (wms)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Alias Summons Issued Wed 10/09 8:56 AM
Alias Summons Issued on FUNDERZGROUP LLC Date Issued 10/9/2024, Answer Due 11/8/2024 . (wms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Request Tue 10/08 11:49 AM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on FUNDERS APP LLC (Balbierz, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Request Tue 10/08 11:09 AM
Request for Alias of Summons(es) by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on FUNDERZGROUP LLC, MonetaFi (Balbierz, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 07/19 8:31 AM
Summons Issued on MonetaFi Date Issued 7/19/2024, Answer Due 8/19/2024 . (wms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 07/18 11:59 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc - summons(es) requested on MonetaFi (Balbierz, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 11:58 AM
Adversary case 24-05011 Complaint by Justin T Balbierz on behalf of Wilson Building Maintenance Inc against MonetaFi. Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Balbierz, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint