10
|
|
10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 07/29 9:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2024. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/29 1:10 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 07/29/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 07/29 12:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 11:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Harley-Davidson, Inc... (Ogunade, Esther)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/24 4:21 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, via Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Segilola Ogunade (Ogunade, Esther)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/24 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dommond Edward Lonnie (Lonnie, Dommond)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/18 11:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harley-Davidson, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Harley-Davidson Motor Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Harley- Davidson, Inc. for Harley-Davidson, Inc.. (von der Lancken, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 11:27 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Marin. Their case number is CV0001656. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19633606). Filed by Harley-Davidson, Inc..(von der Lancken, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 5
Civil Cover Sheet
|