Rhodman v. Walmart Inc.
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brandy R Mcmillion |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11864 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Wayne County Circuit, 24-005970-CZ |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Rhodman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order
Wed 08/28 3:55 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond (ECF No.7 ). Reset Motion Deadline as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Response due by 9/12/2024 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/28 1:40 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Courtney Rhodman (Cohen, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
minutes
~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Stipulation and Order
Tue 08/13 4:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIMETO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS re5 Stipulation. Reset Deadline as to4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) : Response due by 8/29/2024 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/13 3:23 PM
STIPULATION re4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) to Extend Time to Respond by Courtney Rhodman (Cohen, Steven) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/25 5:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Walmart Inc.. (Chichester, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/19 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Z. Cohen on behalf of Courtney Rhodman. (Cohen, Steven) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Fri 07/19 3:47 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Thu 07/18 6:16 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Walmart Inc. (Chichester, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 2:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 24-005970-CZ. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9868109 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Chichester, Michael) |