Beedy v. CBRE Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas R Cole |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00383 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 6:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dale Belknap
642 Mawyer Drive
Columbus, OH 43085 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CBRE Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamisha Beedy
3196 Millstone Lp
Powell, OH 43065 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 3:29 PM
ORDER transferring case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 7/22/24. (sct) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional
Mon 07/22 4:28 PM
Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Columbus as case number 2:24-cv-3750. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:24-cv-3750. (sct) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 07/19 3:31 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dale Belknap, CBRE Inc., originally filed on 6/14/2024 in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas by Tamisha Beedy. (kh) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 24CV004712 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10072907), filed by CBRE Inc.. (Murch, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Dale Belknap, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Filings |