KAHMAR v. PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mia Roberts Perez |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03157 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 240601864 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHAYNE KAHMAR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Acceptance of Service by Agreement
Tue 08/13 11:10 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Agreement Re: accepted service for All Defendants. (MAGGIO, BRIAN) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/12 2:40 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY.(FRIEDMAN, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 08/08 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIEL J. TWILLA on behalf of PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY(TWILLA, DANIEL) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 08/08 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER on behalf of PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/05 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(FRIEDMAN, DAVID) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/02 4:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SHAYNE KAHMAR.(MAGGIO, BRIAN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 07/26 2:46 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION (ECF NO.5 ), PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 8/2/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 07/26/2024. 07/26/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Thu 07/25 3:25 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 07/25 9:49 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Bad Faith and UTPCPL Claims by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY. (DAPPER, KATHLEEN) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 10:01 AM
ORDER THAT ORDERED THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MIA ROBERTS PEREZ ON 7/19/24. 7/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Disclosure of Citizenship
Thu 07/18 2:56 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY . (DAPPER, KATHLEEN) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Thu 07/18 2:55 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY.(DAPPER, KATHLEEN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Thu 07/18 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17610807), filed by PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY.(TWILLA, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 5 Case Management Track Designation Form, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service |