Worth v. MC2 Realty, LLC et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Mcelroy |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00281 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Newport County Superior Court, NC-24-00258 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
KBC Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MC2 Realty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spencer Worth
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing (Form Attached)
Tue 08/20 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 03:45 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 296 9770, Passcode: 818655) (Potter, Carrie) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/16 12:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by KBC Realty, LLC, MC2 Realty, LLC. (Scavone, Luana) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/25 11:31 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by KBC Realty, LLC, MC2 Realty, LLC.(Scavone, Luana) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record
Thu 07/18 3:38 PM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/18 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon P. Ruggieri on behalf of All Defendants (Ruggieri, Brandon) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/18 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana DiSarra Scavone on behalf of All Defendants (Scavone, Luana) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Thu 07/18 3:11 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Thu 07/18 2:51 PM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newport County Superior Court, Case Number NC-2024-0258. (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute,or IFP.), filed by KBC Realty, LLC, MC2 Realty, LLC.(Scavone, Luana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 07/18 2:56 PM
Filing fee paid: $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2020466 re:1 New Case/Notice of Removal. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/18 3:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |