Doucet v. Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Truncale |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00287 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 58th Judicial Dist. Ct. of Jefferson County, TX, 24DCCV1049 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Walmart Stores Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Doucet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order
Tue 08/27 4:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/8/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/27/24. (kcv) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference
Mon 08/26 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2024 from 12:00 PM - 12:20 PM. Court will enter scheduling order. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Christopher Kirchmer; Defense - William Thorne. (Court Reporter Not Recorded.) (KMR) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 08/20 2:01 PM
AGREED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.(Spivey, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/13 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Filing Initial Disclosures of Walmart Texas, LLC (formerly Walmart Stores Texas, LLC) by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC (Spivey, Karen) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/22 2:13 PM
ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by August 8, 2024. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 11:30 AM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 7/22/24. (kcv) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Fri 07/19 10:07 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (kcv) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/19 10:06 AM
ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in State Court) to5 Original Petition by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC.(kcv) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 10:05 AM
ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in State Court) against Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, filed by Howard Doucet.(kcv) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 07/18 3:05 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC (Spivey, Karen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 07/18 2:54 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC. (Spivey, Karen) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 07/18 2:46 PM
ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC. (Spivey, Karen) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC from 58th Judicial Dist. Ct. of Jefferson County, TX, case number 24DCCV1049. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10246495), filed by Walmart Stores Texas, LLC.(Spivey, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Citation of Service and Notice of Service of Process on Walmart Stores Texas, LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Deft Walmart Texas, LLC (formerly Walmart Stores Texas, LLC)s State Court Answer, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - State Court Case Summary, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - List of Parties and Counsel, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - State Court Information Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/19 10:03 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv) |