August Image, LLC v. Face, LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Illston |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04329 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Face, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
August Image, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/20 9:13 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Face, LLC. (Vondran, Steven) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by August Image, LLC. Face, LLC served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Vondran (Vondran, Steven) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Face, LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Remark
Fri 07/19 9:24 AM
Copy of3 emailed to copyright office. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/18 3:31 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 1:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/18 12:53 PM
Proposed Summons. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Copyright
Thu 07/18 12:51 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/18 12:49 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by August Image, LLC (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Face, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19634399.). Filed by August Image, LLC.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |