Progressive Preferred Insurance Company v. McKenzie et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02780 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:25 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Rhonda Jean Guertin
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Elias John Hoernemann
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Kristina McKenzie
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhonda Jean Guertin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elias John Hoernemann
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kristina McKenzie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Progressive Preferred Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Reply to Counterclaim
Wed 09/04 4:39 PM
REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Tue 08/27 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/27/2024. (HAM) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Reply to Counterclaim
Mon 08/26 1:36 PM
REPLY to Counterclaim of McKenzie filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
Sunday, August 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Reply to Counterclaim
Sun 08/25 4:16 PM
REPLY to Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Rhonda Jean Guertin. (Stempel, Richard) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Sun 08/25 4:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Elias John Hoernemann. (Stempel, Richard) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Sun 08/25 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Rhonda Jean Guertin. filed by Rhonda Jean Guertin. (Stempel, Richard) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 08/25 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S Stempel on behalf of Elias John Hoernemann. (Stempel, Richard) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sun 08/25 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S Stempel on behalf of Rhonda Jean Guertin. (Stempel, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued - Non-Standard
Tue 08/13 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (BTX) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/13 3:58 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/13 3:54 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR Summons Issued as to Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (BTX) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (BTX) |
|
12 | 12
service
Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons
Tue 08/13 9:16 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Kristina McKenzie. (Kiernan, Thomas) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution
Tue 08/13 9:12 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Kristina McKenzie. (Kiernan, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/13 9:07 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Kristina McKenzie. (Kiernan, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/13 8:31 AM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/WILL REFILE RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Kristina McKenzie. (Kiernan, Thomas) Modified text on 8/13/2024 (BTX) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 08/08 3:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. filed by Kristina McKenzie. (Kiernan, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Rule 7-1 Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons and Complaint Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Supplement Notice of Appearance | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Return of Service Executed
Thu 07/25 2:48 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Elias John Hoernemann on 07/24/2024, filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Tue 07/23 11:13 AM
EXHIBIT 1 Corrected Exhibit re1 Complaint, filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 07/23 10:05 AM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Rhonda Jean Guertin on 07/22/2024, filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 07/23 10:04 AM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Kristina McKenzie on 07/22/2024, filed by Progressive Preferred Insurance Company. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 8:34 AM
Summons Issued as to Rhonda Jean Guertin, Elias John Hoernemann, Kristina McKenzie. (CLK) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/19 8:31 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2780 DSD/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Rhonda Jean Guertin, Elias John Hoernemann, Kristina McKenzie (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11201602) filed by Progressive Preferred Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Warner, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |