Johnson v. Credit Service Inc
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | David L Russell |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00729 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-04081 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Credit Service Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lashell Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 08/14 1:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Credit Service Inc. (Wier, Keith) |
|
Saturday, July 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Remand to State Court
Sat 07/27 1:47 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lashell Johnson. (House, Nkem) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-4081 filed by Credit Service Inc.(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to State Court Regarding Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - List of Parties and Attorneys, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Keith Wier, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Thu 07/18 6:32 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4477946. (Wier, Keith) |