Roper v. Oklahoma State of
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Scott L Palk |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00727 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Address Change
Fri 08/23 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Antonio Garcia Roper(dtb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Address Change
Fri 08/23 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Antonio Garcia Roper(dtb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Mon 08/19 4:06 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL . Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/19/2024. (llg) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/19 4:04 PM
ORDER . This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 8/19/2024. (llg) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 1:35 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court clerk will send Plaintiff the necessary service papers. The court clerk will also mail the court's local rules to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 7/25/24. (lb) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Mon 07/22 6:00 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio Garcia Roper Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/22/2024. (ekw) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 07/18 2:40 PM
ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Judge Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 07/18/24. (rp) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Previous Cases
Thu 07/18 2:18 PM
PREVIOUS Cases (rp) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 2:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Garcia Roper. (rp) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 2:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Oklahoma State of filed by Antonio Garcia Roper.(rp) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |