Richardson v. Shears et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00050 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Gary Pratt
|
|
Defendant
Rhonda Shears
|
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 09/06 9:59 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Gary Pratt and Rhonda Shears answer due 9/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/6/2024. (ch) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 09/04 9:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Gary Pratt, Rhonda Shears. (Longmire, Wendy) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/13 10:12 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Bradley Richardson. Rhonda Shears served on 8/6/2024. (Fairbanks, Philip) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/13 10:08 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Bradley Richardson. Gary Pratt served on 8/6/2024. (Fairbanks, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 9:35 AM
ORDER granting8 and9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Phillip G. Fairbanks and Bartley K. Hagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/24/2024. (lh) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 8:08 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/21/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/19 6:59 AM
MOTION for attorney Bartley K. Hagerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4123279) by Bradley Richardson.(McWherter, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/19 6:57 AM
MOTION for attorney Phillip G. Fairbanks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4123278) by Bradley Richardson.(McWherter, J.) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 07/18 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/18/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 3:21 PM
Summons issued as to Gary Pratt, Rhonda Shears. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (mg) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 07/18 3:09 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 07/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 07/18 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 3:07 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bradley Richardson. (mg) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Gary Pratt, Rhonda Shears (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4122299), filed by Bradley Richardson.(mg) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/18 3:32 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Brandon McWherter admitted to this court . (mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/18 3:41 PM
KY State Bar status verified as active for Philip G. Fairbanks, Bartley K. Hagerman not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Thu 07/18 3:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Philip G. Fairbanks, Bartley K. Hagerman: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/8/2024. (mg) |