Kennedy v. Owens
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark S Davis |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00445 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/08 11:51 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel Kennedy re4 . (jmey) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/01 11:46 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Daniel Kennedy re3 . (jmey) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 2:46 PM
TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned case shall be, and hereby is, TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Transfer Order to Plaintiff and to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 7/22/2024. Copies mailed 7/22/2024. (jmey) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 2:47 PM
Case transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (jmey) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 07/23 10:44 AM
Case has been opened in the Western District of Virginia as case 7:24-cv-00470, filed 7/22/2024. (jmey) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 07/18 3:12 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey,) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 3:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Kennedy. (jmey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Prisoner (1983)
Thu 07/18 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against M. Owens (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Daniel Kennedy.(jmey) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |