(PC) Bronson v. Dirkse
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00833 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Defendant
Jeff Dirkse
|
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Bronson
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - Divisional
Fri 07/19 9:11 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2024. New Case Number 2:24-cv-01969-EFB (PC). Old Case Number 1:24-cv-00833-EPG (PC). (Lawrence, A) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 2:01 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Caleb Bronson. (Lawrence, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Thu 07/18 2:00 PM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jeff Dirkse by Caleb Bronson.. (Lawrence, A) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |