Jeremy Holland v. Francisco Santamaria et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06035 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Francisco Santamaria
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Holland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/04/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Thu 08/15 2:30 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (iv) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Fri 08/02 9:45 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Hollandto Order to Show Cause,,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/19 11:52 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Response shall be filed on or before AUGUST 2, 2024. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 07/19 11:50 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This Order serves as the Courts notice to Plaintiff that it will dismiss this action without prejudice on its own motion and without further notice to Plaintiff for failure to comply with this Order. The Court finds these sanctions sufficient and necessary to deter violations of the timely prosecution of these cases without unnecessary intervention by the Court. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 07/19 9:32 AM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 07/18 4:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Francisco Santamaria. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 07/18 3:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 07/18 3:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 07/18 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 07/18 1:50 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 07/18 1:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 07/18 1:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 07/18 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-37858763 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jeremy Holland(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |