DOE (SR) v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04332 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Northern District of California, MDL 3084 CRB |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rasier, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE (SR)
NACHAWATI LAW GROUP 5489 Blair Road
DALLAS, TX 75231 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Rasier, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/22 7:01 AM
Proposed Summons. (Schulte, Steve) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/19 1:52 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 07/19 11:29 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file the proposed summons using the instructions above. Re:1 Complaint filed by JANE DOE (SR) (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/19 11:37 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084 Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-04332-DMR cc: JPMDL (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19634700.). Filed by JANE DOE (SR).(Schulte, Steve) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |