Larson v. O'Malley
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Micko |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02783 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Fri 07/19 2:24 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 7/19/2024. (JLD) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/19 1:31 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Clifford Michael Farrell for Gerald D. Larson. Approved by Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko on 7/19/2024. (jam) |
|
5 | 5
notice
SSA Case Assignment Form Issued
Fri 07/19 8:50 AM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per [LINK:Local Rule 7.2] , this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to: U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota Clerks Office 300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202 Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MMG) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment - SSA Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 8:49 AM
(Text-Ony) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas L. Micko per Social Security List. Please use case number 24-cv-2783 DLM. (MMG) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/18 3:47 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clifford M. Farrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11201887 filed by Gerald D. Larson. (Olson, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Thu 07/18 3:46 PM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Gerald D. Larson. (Olson, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley filed by Gerald D. Larson. No summons requested. (Olson, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |