Marcum vs Warden Pickaway Correctional Institution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah D Morrison |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03722 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/24 4:59 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER - The Clerk of Courts is hereby DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this case to the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division at Dayton, for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/24/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional
Wed 07/24 5:10 PM
Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Dayton, Western as case number 3:24cv209 This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 3:24cv209 (mas) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 07/22 3:46 PM
Habeas Filing fee received: $5, receipt number 200006829. (mas) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Fri 07/19 10:04 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Marcum (kk2) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |