Hicks v. Smith County et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Referred: | Shiva V Hodges |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04000 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, Federal Filers (Bivens) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 08/21 4:27 PM
Letter from Larry Hicks. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/20 2:29 PM
OBJECTIONS to6 Report and Recommendation by Larry Hicks. Reply to Objections due by 9/3/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Tue 08/20 1:57 PM
Letter from Larry Hicks. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Tue 08/13 2:30 PM
Letter from Larry Hicks.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Tue 08/06 12:47 PM
Letter from Larry Hicks.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 cover letter, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 08/01 2:30 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Larry Hicks 2270069 Hughes Unit 3201 FM 929 Gatesville, TX 76597. (cpri) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/01 2:28 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint, recommending the district court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas for further disposition. Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 08/01/2024. (cpri) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Wed 07/31 9:04 AM
Letter from Larry Hicks.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 4:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Hicks. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 2 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 3 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 4 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope, | ||
Att: 7 Envelope, | ||
Att: 8 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against President, The, Smith County, TDCJ, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, filed by Larry Hicks.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 2 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 3 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 4 date and time stamped cover letter, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope, | ||
Att: 7 Envelope, | ||
Att: 8 Envelope |