B.C. et al v. CooperSurgical, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04338 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
CooperSurgical, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
The Cooper Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
B.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C.D.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
Mon 08/26 3:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2025. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/9/2025 at 1:30 p.m. by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 1/8/2025. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/26 1:04 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 08/26 11:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/26 11:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc... (Covington, Jenny) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 08/20 9:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2024 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 08/20 9:28 AM
ORDER re: 7 Stipulation to Extend the Parties Time to Respond. Deadline for parties to respond is extended to 12/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/17/2024 is reset to 1/16/2025 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2025. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. C Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 08/20/2024. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 08/19 4:28 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, to Extend the Parties Time to Respond filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Covington, Jenny) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 11:55 AM
Summons Issued as to CooperSurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 07/19 11:51 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 07/18 3:16 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by B.C., C.D. (Sharp, Dena) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 2:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/18 2:46 PM
Proposed Summons. (Sharp, Dena) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against CooperSurgical, Inc., Does 1-10, The Cooper Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19635111.). Filed by B.C., C.D..(Sharp, Dena) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |