JoBen, LLC v. Westfield Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey M Bryan |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02786 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hubbard County District Court, 29-CV-24-00713 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Westfield Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JoBen, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Thu 08/22 2:07 PM
ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. 1. The parties Stipulation to Stay Proceedings [Docket No.6 ] is APPROVED; 2. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED until further Order of the Court; 3. The dates and deadlines in the Pretrial Scheduling Notice and Order [Docket No.5 ] are CONTINUED sine die; 4. The parties shall file a joint status report on CM/ECF, by no later than January 25, 2025, indicating the status of the case, including identifying any remaining issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/22/2024.(JLB) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order to Judge - Other
Thu 08/22 9:15 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re to Stay Proceedings6 Stipulation. (Kennedy, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/22 9:12 AM
STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings by Westfield Insurance Company. Jointly signed by JoBen, LLC. (Kennedy, Kevin) Modified text on 8/22/2024 (CLK) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/13 9:32 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/13/2024.(JLB) |
|
Att: 1 The Case of Aggressive Civility, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/25 10:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Kevin) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/19 8:46 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil (6th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-2786 (JMB/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 4:40 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Westfield Insurance Company. (Kennedy, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hubbard County District Court, case number 29-CV-24-713 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11202093) filed by Westfield Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Kennedy, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |