frahm v. United States of America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | Elizabeth Cowan Wright |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02787 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
United States of America
Customs and Border Protection 1300 Pennslvania Avenue
Washington, DC 20229 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kara Michele Frahm
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/09 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Friedrich A. P. Siekert on behalf of United States of America. (Siekert, Friedrich) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 08/06 5:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Kara Michele Frahm re1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued July 19, 2024 (Beinert, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/06 5:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kara Michele Frahm re1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued July 19, 2024 (Beinert, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 8:59 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (ACH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 07/19 8:59 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-2787 JRT/ECW. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT Kara Michele Frahm against United States of America (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11202089) filed by kara frahm. Filer requests summons issued. (Beinert, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |