Hernandez Martinez et al v. Miller et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Referred: | John F Robbenhaar |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00740 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:55 AM MDT |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Customs and Border Protection
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Troy Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Estrada Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Vargas Marquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Torres Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Rosas Castillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adolfo Rivera Muniz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Ordonez de Rosas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adan Marin Palomino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arturo Limas Quinones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshajandy Hernandez Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genaro Hernandez Campos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Flores Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Viridiana Angel Cazares
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar GRANTING4 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer. Answer due 9/20/2024. (ajp) | |
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Merrick Garland, Troy Miller, U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Lucero, Manuel) | |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of All Defendants (Lucero, Manuel) | |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Troy Miller, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney District of New Mexico. (bc) | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF for Violation of FOIA against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Maria Ordonez de Rosas, Carlos Flores Hernandez, Genaro Hernandez Campos, Daniel Rosas Castillo, Adolfo Rivera Muniz, Maria Vargas Marquez, Viridiana Angel Cazares, Adan Marin Palomino, Joshajandy Hernandez Martinez, Arturo Limas Quinones, Juan Estrada Mendoza, Daniel Torres Perez.(Kryzak, Heather) Modified on 7/18/2024 (bc) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9455818 re1 Complaint, filed by Carlos Flores Hernandez, Daniel Rosas Castillo, Genaro Hernandez Campos, Adan Marin Palomino, Maria Vargas Marquez, Adolfo Rivera Muniz, Arturo Limas Quinones, Daniel Torres Perez, Viridiana Angel Cazares, Juan Estrada Mendoza, Joshajandy Hernandez Martinez, Maria Ordonez de Rosas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kryzak, Heather) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) |