McKnight-Cross et al v. Yancy et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00872 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Davidson County, 24C1388 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hoosier Transit, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safeway Drive Away, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Debbie Yancy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Cross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica McKnight-Cross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 08/28 2:40 PM
ORDER: As is the court's usual procedure, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 16, 2024 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of the pending Motion to Remand10 . The Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference17 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/28/2024. (kc) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/26 1:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of17 MOTION to Stay re9 Order, Set Hearings filed by Jessica McKnight-Cross . (Kilgore, James) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Stay
Mon 08/26 1:19 PM
MOTION to Stay re9 Order, Set Hearings by Jessica McKnight-Cross. (Kilgore, James) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 08/19 4:10 PM
REPLY to Response to re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessica McKnight-Cross.(Kilgore, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Crash Report | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Wed 08/14 9:04 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#15 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (kc) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/12 10:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Safeway Drive Away, Inc., Debbie Yancy. (Kopet, Angela) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/12 9:27 AM
NOTICE by Hoosier Transit, Inc. (Miller, Chancey) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 9:25 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hoosier Transit, Inc.. (Miller, Chancey) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/12 9:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Hoosier Transit, Inc..(Miller, Chancey) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
6
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 07/30 11:22 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessica McKnight-Cross .(Kilgore, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Summons Yancey, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Summons Hoosier, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Summons Safeway, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service Hoosier, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Email Notification | ||
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 07/30 11:17 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jessica McKnight-Cross. (Kilgore, James) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/23 9:03 AM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for November 4, 2024 is RESET for Monday, September 16, 2024 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/22/2024. (kc) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 07/22 9:04 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Angela Cirina Kopet admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:12 PM
Defendant Safeway Drive Away, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Safeway Drive Away, Inc..(Kopet, Angela) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:11 PM
Defendant Debbie Yancey's ANSWER to Complaint by Debbie Yancy.(Kopet, Angela) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/19 2:08 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safeway Drive Away, Inc., Debbie Yancy. (Kopet, Angela) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Thu 07/18 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2024 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Thu 07/18 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 07/18 4:48 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 07/18 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway Drive Away, Inc., Debbie Yancy from Circuit Court of Davidson County, case number 24C1388. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATNMDC-4123177)(, #5 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(am) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appearance, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Defendant Safeway Drive Away's Certificate of Citizenship, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Defendant Safeway Drive Away's Rule 7.01 Corporate Disclosure Statement | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 07/18 4:51 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for James Patrick Kilgore, Angela Cirina Kopet admitted to this court . (am) |