OPTIQUS VISION INC
Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Edward A Godoy |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-02986 |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
OPTIQUS VISION INC.
1 Calle Acuarela Ste 103
Guaynabo, PR 00969-3591 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
OFFICE OF THE US TRUSTEE (UST) OCHOA BUILDING 500 TANCA STREET SUITE 301
SAN JUAN, PR 00901 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of service
Fri 08/30 12:37 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 08/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Due Date
Tue 08/27 10:03 AM
ORDER: The motion filed by the debtor requesting extension of time to file the monthly operating report for the month of July 2024 (docket #13) is hereby granted. Order due by 9/11/2024. . Signed on 8/27/2024.(BORREGO, MARTA) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of time
Wed 08/21 4:49 PM
Motion requesting extension of time( 21 days) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
trustee
Minutes Of 341 Meeting Closed
Mon 08/19 3:12 PM
Minutes of 341 meeting closed. filed by JOSE CAPO-IRIARTE on behalf of US TRUSTEE (CAPO-IRIARTE, JOSE) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Fri 08/16 11:25 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Amended . Filed by ENRIQUE M ALMEIDA BERNAL on behalf of OPTIQUS VISION INC (ALMEIDA BERNAL, ENRIQUE) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of service
Sat 08/10 12:35 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 08/09/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Employment Of Professional
Wed 08/07 11:41 AM
ORDER APPROVING EMPLOYMENT OF PROFESSIONAL . Signed on 8/7/2024.(Colon, Tatiana) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice Of Appearance And Request For Notice
Tue 08/06 10:35 AM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by MAXIMILIANO A PLA MENDEZ on behalf of Kim-Sam PR Retail, LLC. (PLA MENDEZ, MAXIMILIANO) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of service
Sat 07/27 12:37 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 07/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Setting Status Conference
Wed 07/24 10:41 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Hearing scheduled 9/25/2024 at 01:30 PM at Microsoft Teams Video & Audio Conferencing and/or Telephonic Hearings. Signed on 7/24/2024.(BORREGO, MARTA) |
|
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of service
Mon 07/22 12:32 AM
Certificate of service Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
court
Notice Of 341 Meeting Of Creditors - Chapter 11 & 12
Fri 07/19 8:17 AM
Notice to creditors: 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/19/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic Conference Information for AUST/Trial Attys. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 10/18/2024. Proof of Claims due by 11/18/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 1/15/2025. (AGUAYO LOPEZ, BRENDA) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
9
pgs
motion
Employment
Thu 07/18 6:53 PM
Application to employ Attorney, Almeida & Davila, PSC (with 14 day objection language) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto docket of credit card
Thu 07/18 3:13 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-02986 11] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16948335, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 11
Thu 07/18 3:05 PM
Voluntary petition under chapter 11 Non-Individual With Schedules, With Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor, With Statement of Financial Affairs, With Corporate Resolution, With List of creditors. List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Attorney Statement of Compensation $8000 Fee Amount $1738 Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 01/14/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/14/2025.. Filed by ENRIQUE M ALMEIDA BERNAL on behalf of OPTIQUS VISION INC. (ALMEIDA BERNAL, ENRIQUE) |