Ouch v. Chevron Corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04345 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Alight Financial Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chevron Corporation Short Term Disability Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Ouch
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 09/06 4:36 PM
STIPULATION re17 Stipulation for Third Extension of Time for Defendant Alight Financial Solutions to REspond to Complaint [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Alight Financial Solutions. (Higbee, Charan) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 08/29 11:04 AM
STIPULATION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT ALIGHT FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Alight Financial Solutions. (Higbee, Charan) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/27 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE OF HENRY I. WILLETT III. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 08/27 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE OF BELINDA D. JONES Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 27, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/26 1:41 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19773021.) filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Chevron Corporation Short Term Disability Plan.(Willett, Henry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/26 1:36 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19772885.) filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Chevron Corporation Short Term Disability Plan.(Jones, Belinda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 08/14 1:34 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT ALIGHT FINANCIAL SOLUTIONS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [L.R. 6-1 (a)] filed by Alight Financial Solutions. (Higbee, Charan) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 08/06 1:55 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Chevron Corporation Short Term Disability Plan. (Naor, Rachel) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/26 2:03 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Mon 07/22 2:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2024. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/22/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/22 10:06 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/22/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 07/22 7:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 3:11 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christine Ouch.. (Kim, Brian) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/18 4:59 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 4:58 PM
Summons Issued as to Alight Financial Solutions, Chevron Corporation, Chevron Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Chevron Corporation Short Term Disability Plan. (ecg, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 3:49 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/18 3:41 PM
Proposed Summons.(Kim, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Proposed Summons-STD Plan, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons-LTD Plan, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Proposed Summons-Alight | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR UNPAID WAGES/SALARY, AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS UNDER ERISA against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19635683.). Filed by Christine Ouch.(Kim, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |