Boulanger v. USA
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Paul J Barbadoro |
Referred: | Andrea K Johnstone |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00216 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment
Fri 07/19 8:40 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 2 Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (lw) |
|
2 | 2
order
Motion to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255
Thu 07/18 4:37 PM
///ORDER RE 1 Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255. The motion, document number 1, filed on July 8, 2024 constitutes a successive motion under § 2255, which must be certified by the Court of Appeals pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255(h). The movant has failed to obtain the required certification. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb) |
|
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 07/18 1:28 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed) |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate Sentence - 2255
Thu 07/18 1:24 PM
MOTION to Vacate Sentence under 28 USC 2255. Notice of Filing to US Attorney with copy of the motion. See also Criminal Case No. 03-cr-218-PB-01. filed by Gerard Boulanger.(ed) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 07/18 1:27 PM
Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-216-PB-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) |
||
notice
Notice of Filing to USA - 2255/2241
Thu 07/18 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(ed) |