62-64 Bank Street, LLC v. Amelio
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon D Oliver |
Referred: | Maria E Garcia |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01206 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carmine Amelio
37 Main Street, #337
New Milford, CT 06776 |
|
Plaintiff
62-64 Bank Street, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Case Remanded to State
Thu 08/08 10:28 AM
Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Litchfield. (Samson, J) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Thu 07/25 2:04 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Samson, J) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 07/24 5:58 PM
ORDER OF REMAND: "[A] court must satisfy itself that it has subject matter jurisdiction and may at any time in the course of litigation consider whether such jurisdiction exists." Mitskovski v. Buffalo & Fort Erie Pub. Bridge Auth. , 435 F.3d 127, 133 (2d Cir. 2006). "If necessary, the court must consider its subject matter jurisdiction sua sponte ." Perez v. Metro. Prop. & Cas. Ins. Co. , No. 3:14-CV-01565 CSH, 2014 WL 7428280, at *1 (D. Conn. Dec. 31, 2014). Regarding removal, "[i]f at any time before final judgment it appears that the district court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, the case shall be remanded." 28 U.S.C.A. § 1447(c). Federal courts possess original jurisdiction over civil actions when the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs, and "the suit is between 'citizens of different States.'" St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins. Co. v. Universal Builders Supply , 409 F.3d 73, 80 (2d Cir. 2005) (quoting 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)(1)). "[T]here must be complete diversity," and "[d]iversity is not complete if any plaintiff is a citizen of the same state as any defendant." Id. Here, Defendant asserts in his Notice of Removal that "the Court has jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1331 and 28 U.S.C. § 1332 because there is sufficient diversity of citizenship because the plaintiff and defendant are citizens of different states." ECF No. 1 at 2. However, Plaintiff alleges that both it and Defendant are residents of Connecticut, thus precluding a finding of complete diversity that would establish diversity jurisdiction. See ECF No. 1 at 2; ECF No. 1-2 at 2, 7-8. Accordingly, this case is REMANDED to state court sua sponte for failure to establish subject matter jurisdiction. A copy of this Order shall be emailed to Defendant. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/24/2024.(Lapsia, T) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing
Tue 07/23 11:38 AM
ORDER granting Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing5 . Self-Represented Filers are Required to Comply with the Standard Electronic Filing Order Docketed at Case Opening. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/23/2024. (Rogers, D) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)
Fri 07/19 12:19 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A) |
|
9 | 9
order
Standing Protective Order (Intake)
Fri 07/19 12:16 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/17/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
8 | 8
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 07/19 12:12 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 7/17/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Fri 07/19 12:09 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2024 Discovery due by 1/16/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2025 Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2024.(Gaskins, A) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 11:36 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7 17-2024 (Shafer, J.) |
|
5 | 5
motion
To Participate in Electronic Filing
Thu 07/18 11:34 AM
MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Carmine Amelio. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
4 | 4
notice
Consent to Electronic Notice
Thu 07/18 11:33 AM
Consent to Electronic Notice by Carmine Amelio. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 11:32 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carmine Amelio. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
2 | 2
misc
Appearance Self Represented Party
Thu 07/18 11:31 AM
Notice of Pro Se Appearance by Carmine Amelio. (Shafer, J.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carmine Amelio from J.D. of Litchfield, case number CV24-6035910-S. (Shafer, J.) |
|
Att: 1 cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 envelope | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/18 11:40 AM
Judge Vernon D. Oliver and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Shafer, J.) |