Hammonds v. Phillips Management Group, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03145 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
Iron Horse Apartments, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillips Management Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XYZ Corps. 1-3
|
|
Plaintiff
Chequila Hammonds
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/26 10:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Rogs & Rpds to Plaintiff by Phillips Management Group, Inc..(Smith, Aaron) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Initial Disclosures
Fri 08/23 4:19 PM
Initial Disclosures by Phillips Management Group, Inc..(Smith, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/22 3:22 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips Management Group, Inc.. (Smith, Aaron) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/19 1:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chequila Hammonds. (Michelman, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
discov
Initial Disclosures
Mon 08/19 1:30 PM
Initial Disclosures by Chequila Hammonds.(Michelman, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/14 1:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case shall proceed on a 6-month discovery track. Dispositive motions and Daubert motions with regard to expert testimony shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. If no dispositive motions are filed, the parties' proposed consolidated pretrial order shall be filed no later than 45 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 8/14/2024. (ane) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Wed 08/14 1:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A review of the docket in this case shows that the parties have not complied with Local Rule 3.3 of this Court requiring counsel for all private (nongovernmental) parties to file a certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement at the time of first appearance. LR 3.3A, NDGa. The parties are DIRECTED to file their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, if applicable, within 10 days of the date of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned in the event the parties fail to file within this time frame. Entered by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 8/14/2024. (sap) |
||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Tue 08/13 2:17 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Chequila Hammonds. (Michelman, Aaron) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/02 4:56 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 8/2/2024. (sap) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/29 2:34 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah E. Geraghty for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-3145-SEG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/29/2024. (dob) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Thu 07/18 9:21 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Iron Horse Apartments, LLC and Phillips Management Group, Inc. Discovery ends on 12/16/2024.(dgr) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 07/18 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Phillips Management Group, Inc. and Iron Horse Apartments, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13578237)(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A with State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |