Taylor v. Lumsden
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Referred: | Justin S Anand |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03155 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 08/22 4:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). (ane) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Thu 08/22 3:58 PM
ORDER ADOPTING2 Final Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 8/22/2024. (ane) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/22 4:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ane) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/22 4:04 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jimmy L Taylor re4 Order,5 Clerk's Judgment. (ane) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Wed 08/21 2:28 PM
Submission of2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (sap) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/31 9:47 AM
ORDER for Service of2 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/31/2024. (ane) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final
Wed 07/31 9:46 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint, filed by Jimmy L Taylor. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1406(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/31/2024. (ane) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/31 9:48 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jimmy L Taylor re2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (ane) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 10:45 AM
Submission of1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dgr) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Jimmy L Taylor.(dgr) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |