Jones v. Credence Resource Management LLC
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael L Brown |
Referred: | Regina D Cannon |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03156 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Credence Resource Management LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig Jones
4317 Sterling Forest Dr.
Decatur, GA 30034 |
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice
Fri 09/06 10:47 AM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on this 6th day of September, 2024. (pdt) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/06 10:48 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Craig Jones re9 Order. (pdt) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/05 1:15 PM
ANSWER to4 COMPLAINT by Credence Resource Management LLC. Discovery ends on 2/3/2025.(Smith, Kirsten) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Remark
Thu 08/01 9:42 AM
Package prepared (USM 285, Issued Summons, Complaint, Service Order, and Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures) and forwarded to USM for service upon Credence Resource Management LLC. (pdt) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/01 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Credence Resource Management LLC. (pdt) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Initial Disclosures
Thu 08/01 9:36 AM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Craig Jones. (pdt) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Craig Jones.(jbu) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
order
Notice to Pro Se Parties
Fri 07/19 4:03 PM
NOTICE to Pro Se Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 7/19/2024. (jbu) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP ~Util - Allowing Case to Proceed ~Util - Directing Service by Clerk
Fri 07/19 4:02 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis1 is GRANTED. It is thus ORDERED that Plaintiff's action is ALLOWED TO PROCEED as any other civil action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff the USM 285 form, summons form, and the initial disclosures form. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete these forms and return them to the Clerk of Court within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned if Plaintiff fails to comply. Upon receipt of the completed forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare the service waiver package. If a Defendant does not return the Waiver of Service form to the Clerk of Court within THIRTY-FIVE (35) DAYS following the date the service waiver package was mailed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service a service package. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 7/19/2024. (jbu) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/19 4:08 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Craig Jones re2 Order,3 Notice to Pro Se Parties. Forms sent: IFP, Summons, Initial Disclosures (jbu) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 12:49 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (bmr) |
||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 07/18 2:32 PM
Notification of Docket Correction. Case originally filed under 34-3156 Case number corrected. (bmr) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 12:48 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Craig Jones.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |