Williams v. Hothem
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00165 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
Andrew Hothem
|
|
Plaintiff
Cornell Williams
5434 Cape Road
Gillsville, GA 30543 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 08/14 4:45 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice. (ddm) |
|
5 | 5
9
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous
Wed 08/14 4:29 PM
ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/14/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/14 4:45 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cornell Williams re6 Clerk's Judgment,5 Order. (ddm) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 08/14 4:46 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/22 5:53 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Richard W. Story no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-00165-SCJ. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/22/2024. (rsg) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/22 5:54 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cornell Williams re4 Order Reassigning Case. (rsg) |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 07/22 5:54 PM
Submission of3 Complaint, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rsg) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Cornell Williams.(rsg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 5:02 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. The Clerk is directed to submit this action to the District Judge for review of Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/18/2024. (rsg) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 3:16 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cornell Williams.(rsg) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 3:20 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rsg) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/18 5:04 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cornell Williams re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rsg) |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Thu 07/18 5:07 PM
Submission of3 Complaint, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg) |