PEREZ v. FCI BEAUMONT
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Karen M Williams |
Referred: | Sharon A King |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-07858 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Mon 07/29 12:18 PM
Order3 and Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis sent to Plaintiff via regular U.S. mail. (sms2, n.m.) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 07/29 12:14 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to Administratively Terminate this case. The Clerk shall forward Plaintiff a blank form entitled "Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification (Civil Rights)". If Plaintiff wishes to re-open this case, he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this order. Plaintiff's writing shall include either the $405 filing fee, or a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis including an affidavit of indigence and a certified copy of plaintiff's trust fund account statement showing each individual transaction that occurred during the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/26/2024. (sms2, n.m.) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers
Thu 07/18 4:32 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (sms2, n.m.) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Thu 07/18 4:31 PM
Complaint Received. No IFP/FF Received. (sms2) |