Riahi v. Navy Federal Credit Union
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arenda L Wright Allen |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00439 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 12:2601 Violation of Real Estate Settlement Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Navy Federal Credit Union
|
|
Plaintiff
Holly Jo Riahi
2028 Melstone Drive
Virginia Beach, VA 23456 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Brief in Support
Wed 09/11 11:27 AM
Brief in Support to9 MOTION to Quash Service filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Oliveri, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Quash
Wed 09/11 11:26 AM
MOTION to Quash Service by Navy Federal Credit Union. (Oliveri, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 09/11 11:25 AM
NOTICE by Navy Federal Credit Union of Limited Appearance (Oliveri, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/30 3:03 PM
Two (2) SUMMONSES Returned Executed as to Navy Federal Credit Union, served on 8/21/2024.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/13 11:56 AM
Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Navy Federal Credit Union. Plaintiff advised that service packet is ready for pickup.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/05 9:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Navy Federal Credit Union, filed by Holly Jo Riahi.(ptom) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 2:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation, served on 7/22/2024.(epri, ) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/31 2:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation. Plaintiff advised that service packet is ready for pickup.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/18 11:49 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Holly Jo Riahi (epri, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 11:49 AM
(Subject to Defect - Unsigned) COMPLAINT against Navy Federal Credit Union Foundation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 200004692.), filed by Holly Jo Riahi.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 Ghostwriting Certificate |