Flowers v. Parity Wellness et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Elizabeth Cowan Wright |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02773 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due
Fri 08/30 12:09 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due re4 Order/Notice to Attorney cc: Prison Authorities, Ramsey County Adult Detention Center. (MKB) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Thu 08/29 1:57 PM
ORDER/NOTICE. See ORDER for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/29/2024.(TMA) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Tue 08/06 8:45 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jon Flowers.(LTT) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk's Office re: No Fee or IFP enclosing AO 239
Thu 07/18 8:09 AM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Filing Fee, enclosing (AO 239) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs cc: Jon Flowers (jam) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 8:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Julieh Hooker, Parity Wellness filed by Jon Flowers. Case assigned to Judge Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |