Coleman v. Ramsey County Jail
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine M Menendez |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02775 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Fri 07/19 3:01 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/19/2024. (TJB) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
PPro_se
Exhibit
Thu 07/18 9:19 AM
EXHIBIT re2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Perry K Coleman filed by Perry K Coleman.(jam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (IFP)
Thu 07/18 9:18 AM
Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Perry K Coleman. (jam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Ramsey County Jail filed by Perry K Coleman. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (jam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |