Sanz-Carver v. Oklahoma County District Court
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy D Degiusti |
Referred: | Amanda Maxfield Green |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00723 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Eastern, 6:24-cv-00218 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 3:13 AM CDT |
Petitioner
Kyle Sanz-Carver
#2022003285 NORMAN-CCDC 2550 W Franklin Rd
Norman, OK 73069 |
|
Respondent
Oklahoma County District Court
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Report and Recommendation ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 08/30 4:23 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice to the re-filing for Petitioner's failure to comply with the court's order. Objections to R&R due by 9/20/2024. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/30/2024. (rb) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 08/29 1:19 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re9 Order, as to Kyle Sanz-Carver (ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Contents of Mail Returned | ||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 07/26 10:50 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, as to Kyle Sanz-Carver (ekw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Contents of Mail Returned | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 4:31 PM
ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 7/22/2024. (rb) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 10:05 AM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 07/18/24. (rp) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Previous Cases
Thu 07/18 10:02 AM
NO PREVIOUS Cases (rp) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 07/18 9:55 AM
Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:24-cv-00218. |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 2 pgs OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 7/18/2024.] | |
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Statement of Institutional Accounts by Kyle Sanz-Carver. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 7/18/2024.] | |
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing Petitioner to pay the filing fee of $5 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Petitioner's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. (Filing Fee due by 7/1/2024)(rak, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 7/18/2024.] | |
2 | 2 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White, referring case to Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC § 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-24-218-RAW-GLJ. (rak, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 7/18/2024.] | |
1 | 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Kyle Sanz-Carver. (With attachments)(rak, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Oklahoma Eastern on 7/18/2024.] |