Nguyen v. O'Malley
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04296 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 19, 2024 7:18 PM PDT |
Defendant
Martin O'Malley
|
|
Defendant
SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Woodlawn, MD 21235
|
|
Plaintiff
Brandon Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 3:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin O'Malley.. (Highland, Erin) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/19 12:57 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brandon Nguyen.. (Perales, Monica) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Thu 07/18 1:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CASES SEEKING REVIEW OF SOCIAL SECURITY DECISION UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g) (tn, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 11:53 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 07/18 10:54 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandon Nguyen. (Perales, Monica) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT For Review Of Final Decision Of The Commissioner Of Social Security against Martin O'Malley. Filed by Brandon Nguyen.(Perales, Monica) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |