10
|
|
10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/15 4:21 PM
ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 8/15/2024.(nmc, COURT USER) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 07/19 9:13 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for discovery purposes only. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (smc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Fri 07/19 7:49 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on July 19, 2024. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/18 4:13 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Thu 07/18 3:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jhf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 07/18 11:03 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 11:02 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pshatoia LaRose. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/18 11:00 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pshatoia LaRose. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Thu 07/18 10:59 AM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing ; [PROPOSED] Order filed by Pshatoia LaRose. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
7
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/18 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. Filed by Pshatoia LaRose. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2024.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|