Nobel v. South Florida Stadium LLC et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22751 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 02, 2024 4:42 AM EDT |
Consol Defendant
CONMEBOL
|
|
Consol Defendant
Concacaf
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
Miami Dolphins, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
South Florida Stadium LLC
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
William Pou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BEST Crowd Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Confederacion Sudamericana De Futbol
|
|
Defendant
Confederation of North, Central America and Caribbean Association Football
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
South Florida Stadium LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Das Nobel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 09/13 5:41 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Report by Concacaf, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., William Pou, South Florida Stadium LLC. Responses due by 9/27/2024. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response/Reply (Other)
Fri 09/06 4:11 PM
SUR REPLY to10 EXPEDITED MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Communications with Putative Class Members by South Florida Stadium LLC.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 09/06 3:39 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.33 Defendant South Florida Stadium, LLC's ("Defendant") Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order ("Motion"). Clerks Notice : Filer must separately re-file the proposed surreply, limited to no more than five pages, on or before September 11, 2024, pursuant to Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/06 2:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order Limiting or Preventing Communications with Putative Class Members by South Florida Stadium LLC.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sur-reply, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - to Sur-reply, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - to Sur-reply, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 09/05 7:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Scheduling Report by September 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/05 9:55 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 32 Order. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/24/2024 (amb) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 09/03 5:23 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Enlargement of Time to File Rule 26 Report by Das Nobel. Responses due by 9/17/2024.(Newsome, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/30 6:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 EXPEDITED MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Communications with Putative Class Members filed by Das Nobel.(Warwick, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Hard Rock Stadiums Communication | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 5:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Lauren J. Caisman in case 1-24-cv-22751-BB. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 5:20 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Brian A. Sher 1:24-cv-22751-BB. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 08/30 2:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lauren J. Caisman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17800352 by BEST Crowd Management, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2024. |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Fri 08/30 2:09 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian A. Sher. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17800305 by BEST Crowd Management, Inc.. Responses due by 9/13/2024. |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 8:46 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting (23) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Johanna Spellman in case 1:24-cv-22751-BB. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-22751-BB, 1:24-cv-22828-BB (BB) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/30 8:45 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting (22) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark S. Mester in case 1:24-cv-22751-BB. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-22751-BB, 1:24-cv-22828-BB (BB) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Thu 08/29 5:00 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Johanna Spellman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17797947 by South Florida Stadium LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2024.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
Thu 08/29 4:54 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark S. Mester. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17797884 by South Florida Stadium LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2024.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 08/28 2:01 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case Number 24-cv-22828-BB is CONSOLIDATED with Case Number 24-cv-22751-BB. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Case Number 24-cv-22828-BB for administrative purposes only. All future filings in Case Number 24-cv-22828-BB shall be made under Case Number 24-cv-22751-BB only. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/27/2024. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-22751-BB, 1:24-cv-22828-BB (nan) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/23 10:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 EXPEDITED MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Communications with Putative Class Members filed by South Florida Stadium LLC. Replies due by 8/30/2024.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Ticketmaster Terms of Use, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Hard Rock Stadium Post, dated July 15, 2024, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 August 5, 2024 Email, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Declaration and Release of Claims | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/20 5:05 PM
Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Das Nobel (Newsome, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 08/20 10:46 AM
ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
17 | 17
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Tue 08/20 10:35 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Defendant South Florida Stadium, LLC, d/b/a Hard Rock Stadium ("Defendant") to file an expedited response to Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Protective Order Limiting Communications with Putative Class Members ("Expedited Motion"), ECF No.10 . Defendant shall file its response to the Expedited Motion on or before August 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 08/20 12:47 PM
Set Deadlines per DE 17 Order as to10 Motion. Response due by 8/23/2024. (kpe) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions
Mon 08/19 4:15 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by South Florida Stadium LLC (Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 08/19 8:16 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by September 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 08/19 8:14 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by September 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 08/16 5:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint,, by BEST Crowd Management, Inc.. Attorney Clement Ryan Reetz added to party BEST Crowd Management, Inc.(pty:dft). |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 08/16 1:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint,, by Confederation of North, Central America and Caribbean Association Football. (Silverman, Lawrence) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/16 1:48 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Confederation of North, Central America and Caribbean Association Football (Silverman, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Expedited Motion
Wed 08/14 6:44 PM
EXPEDITED MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Communications with Putative Class Members by Das Nobel. (Warwick, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 08/13 7:19 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Das Nobel. BEST Crowd Management, Inc. served on 7/31/2024, response/answer due 8/21/2024. (Warwick, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 08/13 7:03 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Das Nobel. South Florida Stadium LLC served on 7/30/2024, response/answer due 9/19/2024. (Warwick, Brian) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 08/13 3:38 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.6 Defendant South Florida Stadium LLC's ("Defendant") Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 19, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 08/13 3:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint,, by South Florida Stadium LLC.(Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - proposed order | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/13 3:05 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Florida Stadium LLC (Pallett-Vasquez, Melissa) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline
Tue 08/13 4:04 PM
Set Response Due Deadline per DE 7 Order: South Florida Stadium LLC response due 9/19/2024. (kpe) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
7
pgs
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Mon 07/22 2:37 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/19 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to BEST Crowd Management, Inc., Confederacion Sudamericana De Futbol, Confederation of North, Central America and Caribbean Association Football, South Florida Stadium LLC. (nan) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Fri 07/19 3:45 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/19 2:50 AM
COMPLAINT against BEST Crowd Management, Inc., Confederacion Sudamericana De Futbol d/b/a CONMEBOL, Confederation of North, Central America and Caribbean Association Football d/b/a Concacaf, South Florida Stadium LLC d/b/a Hard Rock Stadium. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17689928, filed by Das Nobel.(Warwick, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Purchases, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s) South Florida Stadium LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) CONMEBOL, | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s) Concacaf, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) BEST Crowd Management, Inc. |